Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Corder, Patrick Wayne, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Corder, Sarah Allison, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Parent Child |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order or Judgment to Pro Se Party ORDER MODYIFYING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER in SAPCR (OCA - on a Reopen) | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR: ON JULY 25TH, 2022 AT 1:30 PM |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR:7/11/2022 AT 1:30PM |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: 6/15/2022 AT 3:20PM |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify - Reopen (OCA) JPETITION TO MODIFY THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration IN SUPPORT OF CHANGING PRIMARY CUSTODY WITHIN ONE YEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.