Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valenzuela, Carmen Sanchez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arellano, Angel Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING RESET FOR: 12/11/2020 AT 2:00 P.M. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: 11/16/2020 AT 4:00 P.M. |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: 11/16/2020 AT 4:00 PM |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: AUGUST 28, 2020 AT 10 AM |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.