Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carrillo, Alma, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Carrillo, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW DISMISSAL DOCKET HEARING SET FOR DECEMBR 16, 2022, AT 9:00 A.M. |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry: Notice of Dismissal Docket Hearing | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 12, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: JULY 24, 2020 AT 10:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.