Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Uzomah, Adanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Toscano, Andrew E., against Cougar Production, Inc., Hollingsworth, George T, represented by Chaves, Douglas E., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShrode, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Neither party appeared. Any motions to be heard will be denied. |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DELIVERY (COMPLETED DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS) $202.20 CHARGED FOR DEPO FROM UNITED HEALTH CENTERS (MEDICAL & RADIOLOGY) |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DELIVERY (COMPLETED DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS) $236.05 CHARGED FOR DEPO FROM JOHN LAWSON ROCK & OIL (PERSONNEL AND PAYROLL) |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FIAT HEARING |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONTROVERTING AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE/DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) SUPPLEMENTATION OF RULE 194.211! DISCLOSURES |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DELIVERY (COMPLETED DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS) $540.00 CHARGED FOR DEPO OF ADANNA UZOMAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.