Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Velazco, Angel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Spencer, Jason Cord, against Gcc Permian, Llc, Midessa Electric, Llc, represented by Wright, Max E., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShrode, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage > $250K |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: JUNE 8, 2023 AT 9:30 AM |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry: Atty filed a motion for docket control order, but it is not agreed. Will need a hearing, but attorney failed to submit a proposed order setting hearing. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Docket Control Order |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.