Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Clark, Thomas Casey, represented by Brown, Bj, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Defendant appeared, admonished, waived jury trial. case set for plea 3/31 @ 3:00 PM Justin W. Low |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A NEW COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY. EMAILED TO BJ BROWN, DA, AND FWD TO CT ON 03/17/2021 BY HR |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR: 3/18/21 @ 1:30 PM. EMAILED TO D.A, JAIL, & B.BROWN ON 3/9/21 BY D.L. |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT EMAILED TO BJ BROWN ON 09/24/20 BY L.T. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) CC; BJ BROWN, D.A., A. CHAVEZ AND JAIL ON 09/24/20 BY L.T. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW CC; A. CHAVEZ, D.A., AND JAIL ON 09/25/20 BY L.T. |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY FORGERY BY PASSING (GOB) (SJF) ; AGG ASSAULT (SBI) (F2) (X2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.