Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gunn, Linda A., represented by Garcia, Robert V, Fostel, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER OF DISCOVERY | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO ROBERT GARCIA ON 09/03/2021 BY T.R |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO C. FOSTEL AND PSM ON 8/27/2021 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 04272021; PRE TRIAL BONDING SERVICE $10,000 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.