Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carson, Tristan Rashaud, represented by Holmes, Mike, Thomas, Matt L., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING BOND/BAIL REDUCTION. EMAILED TO M. THOMAS & D.A. ON 10/18/2021 BY D.P. |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.