Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Choulat, Michael James, represented by Layh, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO EMAILED TO SCOTT LAYH ON 2/11/2022 BY J.P. |
|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Capias Returned - Served (OCA) | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Capias Issued (OCA-not sealed) USMS HOLD |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.