Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bejarano, Abel, represented by Chavez, Luis A., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SET FOR:12/08/2021 @ 2:00 PM EMAILED TO L. CHAVEZ, DA, APO, AND JAIL ON 11/15/2021 BY MS |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial EMAILED TO APO, D.A. AND CHAVEZ LAW FIRM ON 11/16/2021 BY M.M. |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY P. WILDMAN |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY REQUEST FILED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO L. CHAVEZ ON 09/28/21 BY B.L. |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON09/01/2021 BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.