Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Montemayor, Casandra, represented by Neboh, Felix, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING GUILTY PLEA HEARING FOR:08/31/2021 @ 10:00 AM EMAILED TO F. NEBOH, DA, AND JAIL ON 08/25/2021 BY HR |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Information ABANDON ENDANGER CHILD INT/KNOW/RICK/CRIM NEG (SJF) |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial E-MAILED TO D.A ; APO; FELIX NEBOH AND JAIL ON 08/26/2021 BY T.R |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.