Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Baker, Misty Michelle, represented by Thomas, Matt L., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE SCHEDULED FEBRUARY 8, 2022 @ 10:30 AM. COPY TO M. THOMAS, DA APO AND QUE PASA BAIL BONDS BY MS |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant's Waiver of Right to a Jury Trial | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO QUE PASA BAIL BONDS ON 10/21/21 BY B.L. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 10/16/2021; QUE PASA BAIL BONDS $4,000 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO CLERK (CRIMINAL) BOND REDUCTION. EMAILED TO M. THOMAS AND DA ON 10/14/2021 BY HR |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE REQUESTING A SPEEDY TRIAL AND PROBATION. EMAILED TO M. THOMAS AND DA ON 09/28/2021 BY HR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.