Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mireles, Rudy Flores, represented by Sarabia, Daniel, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Defendant's Notice of Incarceration, Request for a Bond Forfeiture, Request for Issuance of a warrant and Placement of Hold. |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Defendant's Notice of Incarceration, Request for a Bond Forfeiture, Request for Issuance of a Warrant and Placement of Hold. |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR BENCH WARRANT |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR: 9/14/21 @ 10:30 AM. EMAILED TO D.A & D. SARABIA ON 9/1/21 BY D.L. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR:09/21/2021 @ 11:00 AM. EMAILED TO D. SARABIA AND DA ON 08/27/2021 BY HR |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INCARCERATION REQUEST FOR A BOND |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (eFiled Doc) Notice of Incarceration to Court |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Article 39.14 Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.