Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Saenz, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR:MARCH 29,2022 AT 1:30 PM; EMAILED TO AMIGOS, PSM AND DA 03/02/2022 BY L.P |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR: DECEMBER 7TH, 2021 AT 10:00 AM; EMAILED TO D.A. AND AMIGOS BONDING ON 11/12/2021 BY M.M. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO AMIGO'S BONDING ON 8/17/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 05/07/2021; AMIGO'S BONDING $15,000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.