Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Padilla, Edwardo Vasquez, represented by Chavez, Luis A., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO L. CHAVEZ ON 01/24/2022 BY HR |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR:DECEMBER 07,2021 AT 10:00 AM; EMAILED TO D.A. AND AMIGOS BONDING ON 11/12/2021 BY M.M. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.