Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sarabia, Aldan Andrew, represented by Wildman, Phillip, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL Defendant plead to misdemeanors E-MAILED TO D.A AND JAIL ON 2/23/2022 BY T.R; E-MAILED TO PHILLIP WILDMAN ON 3/7/2022 BY T.R |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL (used case closed button, enter disposition,report cjis) {send notice to atty;D.A and to Jail if in jail.} |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Warrant Returned - Served (OCA) 02/01/2022 - NO BOND - REVOKED |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SURRENDER -GOB NOT ISSUED; BOND REVOKED ON 11/19/2021 |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR BONDING CO. TO GO OFF BOND FILED BY P. WILDMAN |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | BAILIFF'S AFFIDAVIT ON DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Warrant Issued (OCA) - NO BOND BOND REVOKED |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER REVOKING BOND EMAILED TO D.A., P. WILDMAN AND PSM ON 11/22/2021 BY M.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.