Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Navarette, Jose, represented by Jimenez, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER OF REPRESENTATION AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF PUNISHMENT EVIDENCE |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF STATE'S INTENTION | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (eFiled Doc) Request for Notice of Punishment Evidence |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (eFiled Doc) Notice of Appearance and Discovery Request |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion (eFiled Doc) Request for Notice of Extraneous Evidence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.