Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ellis, Christopher Antonias, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 09/16/21; AMIGO'S BONDING $20,000. |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Capias Returned - Served (OCA) | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO AMIGO'S BONDING ON 8/27/21 BY D.L. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
BOND FILED POSTED AT JAIL ON 08/10/21; AMIGO'S BONDING $20,000.00 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Capias Issued (OCA-not sealed) USMS HOLD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.