Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Scott, Justonn Khyle, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Indictment CONTINUOUS VIOLENCE AGAINST THE FAMILY 25.11 THIRD DEGREE FELONY |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.