Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Conley, Shaun Russell, represented by Fostel, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arraignment Sent E-MAILED TO CHRIS FOSTEL ON 10/25/2021 BY L.U. |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Capias Returned - Served (OCA) | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED DUPLICATE 10/21/2021 |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO PSM ON 08/18/2021 BY S.C. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO C. FOSTEL ON 8/17/21 BY SC |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Capias Issued (OCA-not sealed) | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.