Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jackson, Aurora, Jackson, Raymond, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stuart, Caleb, Merka, Brian Christopher, against Forrest Brothers Tire Company, Inc., Arredondo, Emery Yasmine, represented by Matthews, Arlene, Blankenship, Mark Owen, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Designate Experts |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Designate Experts |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE. SET FOR: 02/02/2023 at 2:00 pm |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE SET FOR: JANUARY 4, 2023 AT 10:30 AM |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE EXPERTS |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' EXPERTS |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Experts |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO RESPONSE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.