Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Close, Tara M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Close, Kayla M, represented by Clifton, William W., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 70th District Court with Whalen, Denn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhalen, Denn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House70th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Friendly Suit. |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR: 1/21/2021 AT 10:30 AM |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR: 01/14/2021 AT 10:00 AM |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION PLs' Second Amended Petition |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 5, 2021 AT 3:00 PM |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.