Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilbanks, Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vaughn, David Allen, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Shipman, L. Dee Party(Vaughn, David AllenJudgment: ( - Other AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShipman, L. Dee Party(Vaughn, David AllenJudgment: ( - Other AGREED ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP AGREED JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 1999 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support US MILITARY ARMY-ACTIVE AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) Vol./Book IMG, Page NG US MILITARY ARMY-ACTIVE AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
November 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING (NOA.WOW) Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE WRIT OF WITHHOLDING (NOA.WOW) Vol./Book IMG, Page NG |
|
November 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support US MILITARTY ARMY-ACTIVE AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) Vol./Book IMG, Page NG US MILITARTY ARMY-ACTIVE AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
March 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support CONTEMPORARY SERVICES AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) CONTEMPORARY SERVICES AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
October 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support 3-FACILITY CONSTRUCTION SER PW AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) 3-FACILITY CONSTRUCTION SER PW AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
July 22, 2003 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support GARDEN RIDGE MANAGEMENT INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) GARDEN RIDGE MANAGEMENT INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support LUNDY SERVICES INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) LUNDY SERVICES INC AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
December 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support RICHARD C BECK & SANDRA L. BECK AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) RICHARD C BECK & SANDRA L. BECK AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
November 13, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support BUSINESS STAFFING INCORPORATED AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) BUSINESS STAFFING INCORPORATED AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
|
September 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Amended Order or Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support COREMAX AEROSPACE INC. AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) COREMAX AEROSPACE INC. AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (AM/OW) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.