Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chad D. Elsey filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hagler, James Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 211th Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki Party(Hagler, James AndersonJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER DISMISSING APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE order DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Party(Hagler, James AndersonJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER ON MOTION TO VACATE EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER DISMISSING APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE order DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2008 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court House211th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reporter's/Officer's Cert. of Deposition: Deposition of DEPOSITION OF EVANNA LEA HAGLER REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION (RECERT) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM DEPOSITION OF EVANNA LEA HAGLER REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION (RECERT) |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: WAYNE NORTHCUTT, AND CHAD D ELSEY RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM WAYNE NORTHCUTT, AND CHAD D ELSEY RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE SENT TO (R.306) |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM:BROWN PRUITT PETERSON & WAMBSGANSS P.C. TO:WAYNE NORTHCUTT LETTER (LETTER) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM FROM:BROWN PRUITT PETERSON & WAMBSGANSS P.C. TO:WAYNE NORTHCUTT LETTER (LETTER) |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Shipman, L. Dee) |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order TO EXTEND PROTECTIVE ORDER AGREED ORDER (AO) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO EXTEND PROTECTIVE ORDER AGREED ORDER (AO) |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER(FILED BY JAMES A HAGLER) MOTION TO VACATE (VACATE) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM EX PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER(FILED BY JAMES A HAGLER) MOTION TO VACATE (VACATE) |
|
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Protective order notice returned DELIVERED TO:JAMES ANDERSON HAGLER ON 04/22/08 PROTECTIVE ORDER NOTICE RETURNED (PONR) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM DELIVERED TO:JAMES ANDERSON HAGLER ON 04/22/08 PROTECTIVE ORDER NOTICE RETURNED (PONR) |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application for Protective Order APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (APO) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (APO) |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Issued TO:JAMES ANDERSON HAGLER(PUT UP FRONT TO BE PICKED UP) PROTECTIVE ORDER NOTICE ISSUED (PONI) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO:JAMES ANDERSON HAGLER(PUT UP FRONT TO BE PICKED UP) PROTECTIVE ORDER NOTICE ISSUED (PONI) |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order TO CONSTABLE OR SHERIFF OF DENTON, TEXAS ORDER (ORD) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM TO CONSTABLE OR SHERIFF OF DENTON, TEXAS ORDER (ORD) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.