Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Kelly Clark, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Johnson, Suyapa Lizeth, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Gabriel, Lee Converted Disposition:Party: JOHNSON, KELLY CLARK Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed Party(Johnson, Kelly ClarkJudgment: (A - Agreed Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGabriel, Lee Converted Disposition:Party: JOHNSON, KELLY CLARK Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed Party(Johnson, Kelly ClarkJudgment: (A - Agreed Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Address Change Notification Party: Johnson, Kelly Clark Party: Johnson, Kelly Clark |
|
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: ADAMS EXTERMINATING; REC'D 04/20/06 BY BRAD BAKER RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB ADAMS EXTERMINATING; REC'D 04/20/06 BY BRAD BAKER RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Final Order Sent to Resp or Defendant(s) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT/DECREE SENT TO RESPONDENT(S) (CCSR) |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) |
|
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order/Notice to Withhold Income For Child Support ORIGINAL ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB ORIGINAL ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Waiver SUYAPA L JOHNSON WAIVER OF SERVICE (WOS) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB SUYAPA L JOHNSON WAIVER OF SERVICE (WOS) |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce BROUGHT BY KELLY C JOHNSON ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page SGB BROUGHT BY KELLY C JOHNSON ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.