Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jennifer Mcclure, against Dowell, Richard Lee, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Rivera-Worley, Carmen Party(Dowell, Richard LeeJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRivera-Worley, Carmen Party(Dowell, Richard LeeJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2006 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Bill of Costs TO ATTY POWERS, RICHARD LEE DOWELL BILL OF COSTS (BOC) Vol./Book IMG, Page VEL TO ATTY POWERS, RICHARD LEE DOWELL BILL OF COSTS (BOC) |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY, CRIMINAL DISTRICT CLERK, ATTY POWERS, RICHARD LEE DOWELL CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) TO DISTRICT ATTORNEY, CRIMINAL DISTRICT CLERK, ATTY POWERS, RICHARD LEE DOWELL CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rivera-Worley, Carmen) Result: Settled | |
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order DAVID FINNEY WITHDRAWN ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL (OPW) Vol./Book IMG, Page CP DAVID FINNEY WITHDRAWN ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL (OPW) |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw FILED BY DAVID FINNEY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (MTWAC) Vol./Book IMG, Page CP FILED BY DAVID FINNEY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (MTWAC) |
|
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Original Answer AND GENERAL DENIAL BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROA) Vol./Book IMG, Page VEL AND GENERAL DENIAL BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ROA) |
|
September 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: RICHARD LEE DOWELL RCVD BY TERI OLSON (NO DATE OF DELIVERY) RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM RICHARD LEE DOWELL RCVD BY TERI OLSON (NO DATE OF DELIVERY) RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: BANKERS INSURANCE CO, SHAWN CAGLE RCVD BY CT CORPORATION ON 09/06/06 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMG, Page SM BANKERS INSURANCE CO, SHAWN CAGLE RCVD BY CT CORPORATION ON 09/06/06 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation TO BANKERS INS CO DBA SHAWN CAGLE-CITY HALL BAIL BONDS CM#71042230169029178323 CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page AL TO BANKERS INS CO DBA SHAWN CAGLE-CITY HALL BAIL BONDS CM#71042230169029178323 CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
|
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Citation TO RICHARD LEE DOWELL CM#71042230169029178330 CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) Vol./Book IMG, Page AL TO RICHARD LEE DOWELL CM#71042230169029178330 CITATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL (CCM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.