Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Petty, Amy Leann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Petty, David Allen, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki Party(Petty, David AllenJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Party(Petty, David AllenJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2005 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Record/Copy Request
Date: November 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Record/Copy Request | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Employment termination letter regarding (FROM BIMBO BAKERIES USA, RE: DAVID PETTY, EFFECTIVE 2/04/08) EMPLOYMENT TERMINATION LETTER (ETL) Vol./Book IMG, Page RCH (FROM BIMBO BAKERIES USA, RE: DAVID PETTY, EFFECTIVE 2/04/08) EMPLOYMENT TERMINATION LETTER (ETL) |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
December 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Returned and filed green card for certified mail sent to: TO MRS. BAIRD'S BAKERIES - SIGNED BY D. URQUHART ON 12/22/05 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP TO MRS. BAIRD'S BAKERIES - SIGNED BY D. URQUHART ON 12/22/05 RETURNED AND FILED GREEN CARD MAILED TO: (RFG) |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Employer's Order to Withhold Earnings EMPLOYERS ORDER TO WITHHOLD EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (EO) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page CP EMPLOYERS ORDER TO WITHHOLD EARNINGS FOR CHILD SUPPORT (EO) |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Cert. of Notice to Employer of Order Withholding TO MRS. BAIRD'S BAKERIES (CERT. MAIL NO. 7104 2230 1690 2682 0591) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) Vol./Book IMG, Page SRA TO MRS. BAIRD'S BAKERIES (CERT. MAIL NO. 7104 2230 1690 2682 0591) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE TO EMPLOYER OF ORDER WITHHOLDING (CCOWE) |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy OF FINAL DECREE PROVIDED TO RESPONDENT BY ATTORNEY CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) OF FINAL DECREE PROVIDED TO RESPONDENT BY ATTORNEY CERTIFIED COPY (C/C) |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF CITATION (WOC) Waiver WAIVER OF CITATION (WOC) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page MMS |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Original Petition for Divorce ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE (OPD) Vol./Book IMAGE, Page MMS |
|
August 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Case Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.