Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
King, Vickie Lynn, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Attorney General Of Texas, against Trevathan, Jason Clay, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Isaacks, Vicki Party(Trevathan, Jason ClayJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP DEFAULT JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsaacks, Vicki Party(Trevathan, Jason ClayJudgment: ( - Other Judgment Amt: 0.00 ORDER IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP DEFAULT JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 1998 |
CategoryOther Family |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) Page SRA FORM VS-165 SENT TO BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS (VS) |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) Order/Notice to Withhold Income For Child Support ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT (O/N) Vol./Book IMG, Page FK |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Waiver OF RIGHTS (JASON TREVATHAN) WAIVER (WAI) Vol./Book IMG, Page FK OF RIGHTS (JASON TREVATHAN) WAIVER (WAI) |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation returned: Delivered to: ON JASON CLAY TREVATHAN, 2/5/05 CITATION RETURNED SERVED (CRS) Vol./Book IMG, Page DJC ON JASON CLAY TREVATHAN, 2/5/05 CITATION RETURNED SERVED (CRS) |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Name: TREVATHAN, JASON CLAY 2005-60465-393 IN THE INTEREST OF SHEA TREVATHAN A MINOR CHILD Type: CIT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: N Return: District Clerk TREVATHAN, JASON CLAY Unserved Serving Method Certified Mail Name: TREVATHAN, JASON CLAY 2005-60465-393 IN THE INTEREST OF SHEA TREVATHAN A MINOR CHILD Type: CIT County: Denton Authority: District Clerk Status: N Return: District Clerk |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion/Petition To Modify PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP MOTION/PETITION TO MODIFY (MOD) Vol./Book IMAGED, Page MH PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP MOTION/PETITION TO MODIFY (MOD) |
|
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Filed document Service Event (Citation) Name: TREVATHAN, JASON CLAY Service Event (Citation) Name: TREVATHAN, JASON CLAY |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Pleadings Transferred IN THE INTEREST OF SHEA TREVATHAN, MINOR CHILD PLEADINGS TRANSFERRED (PLDTRF) Vol./Book IMG, Page NG IN THE INTEREST OF SHEA TREVATHAN, MINOR CHILD PLEADINGS TRANSFERRED (PLDTRF) |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Opening Filing Event Case Filing Atty General Number: 0009031736 Case Filing Atty General Number: 0009031736 |
|
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Transfer Letter FROM GRAYSON COUNTY, CAUSE NO. 98-0428 TRANSFER FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (PRTR) FROM GRAYSON COUNTY, CAUSE NO. 98-0428 TRANSFER FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (PRTR) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.