Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Taf Dallas Industrial Portfolio, Lp, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Kelley B. Hill, against Denton Central Appraisal District, represented by David B. Tabor, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 393rd Judicial District Court with Robison, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Douglas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Appraisal |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
Filing Court House393rd Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: February 10, 2021Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: February 09, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: December 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Hill, Kelley B. Party: Tabor, David B. Party: Hill, Kelley B.Party: Tabor, David B. |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Robison, Douglas ) Agreed Judgment for Parties: Denton Central Appraisal District for Parties: TAF Dallas Industrial Portfolio, LP Agreed Judgment |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Denton Central Appraisal District Party: Denton Central Appraisal District |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Denton Central Appraisal District Party: Denton Central Appraisal District Citation to Denton Central Appraisal District |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Orders for Review of Appraisal Review Board Orders |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Citation |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation e-served in envelope #47599121 Denton Central Appraisal District Unserved e-served in envelope #47599121 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.