Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Quintisha N., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Victoria P. Weaver, against Davis, Wesley M., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 16th Judicial District Court with Shipman, Sherry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShipman, Sherry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House16th Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: December 09, 2020Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: December 08, 2020Original Petition for Divorce
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Support Info Faxed Mailed to State Disbursement Unit | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Davis, Wesley M. Party: Weaver, Victoria P. Party: Davis, Wesley M.Party: Weaver, Victoria P. |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Davis, Quintisha N. for Parties: Davis, Wesley M. Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Support Info Faxed Mailed to State Disbursement Unit | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding From Earnings for Child Support (Judicial Officer: Shipman, Sherry ) Payor: Davis, Wesley M. Payor: Davis, Wesley M. |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) of Testimony Filed by: Davis, Quintisha N. of Testimony |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Davis, Wesley M. Party: Davis, Wesley M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.