Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lewis, Lori, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael E. Frederick, against Townsend, Gerald Alan, Townsend, Joshua Michael, represented by Carlos A. Balido, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Johnson, James S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, James S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryInjury/Damages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court
Date: January 15, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 24, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: September 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit(s) & Records Filed by:: Lewis, Lori & Records |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Party: Lewis, Lori Party: Lewis, Lori |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
First Amended Answer Party: Townsend, Joshua Michael Answer |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure Party: Townsend, Gerald Alan Party: Townsend, Joshua Michael and Request for Disclosure |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury fee paid (This entry only represents the payment of the jury fee - not a document filed with the clerk.) (This entry only represents the payment of the jury fee - not a document filed with the clerk.) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Joshua Michael Townsend Citation to Joshua Michael Townsend |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citation to Gerald Alan Townsend Citation to Gerald Alan Townsend |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition with Written Discovery Attached with Written Discovery Attached |
|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter and Request for Issuance and Request for Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.