Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Malissa Patel filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Turner, Amy J., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryForeclosure: Home Equity-Expedited |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court
Date: January 15, 2021Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: January 15, 2021Motion to Enter
Date: January 13, 2021Application for Foreclosure
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 431st Judicial District Court | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Occupant Party: Traditional Heritage Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Party: Turner, Amy J. Party: OccupantParty: Traditional Heritage Village Homeowners Association, Inc.Party: Turner, Amy J. |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) Rule 736 Default Order for Parties: Occupant for Parties: Traditional Heritage Village Homeowners Association, Inc. for Parties: Turner, Amy J. Rule 736 Default Order |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Default Order Filed by: Traditional Heritage Village Homeowners Association, Inc. Default Order |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Status Regarding: Turner, Amy J. Regarding: Turner, Amy J. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Citation Returned Undelivered Party: Turner, Amy J. Party: Turner, Amy J. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Signature Confirmation Page for Certified Mailer Mailed to: Turner, Amy J. Mailed to: Turner, Amy J. |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Signature Confirmation Page for Certified Mailer Mailed to: Occupant Mailed to: Occupant |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation by First Class Mail Turner, Amy J. Returned Unserved 11/25/2020 Anticipated Method First Class Mail Returned 11/25/2020 Occupant Returned Unserved 10/05/2020 Anticipated Method First Class Mail Returned 10/05/2020 | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation By Certified Mail Turner, Amy J. Served 09/30/2020 Anticipated Method Certified Mail Returned 11/25/2020 Occupant Served 09/30/2020 Anticipated Method Certified Mail Returned 10/05/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.