Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Longoria, Donavun L., Thompson, Amber, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Malcolm G. Renwick, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 442nd Judicial District Court with Haertling, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaertling, Tiffany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2019 |
CategoryInjury/Damages - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House442nd Judicial District Court |
Billing Statement
Date: September 21, 2020Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment
Date: November 12, 2019Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Longoria, Donavun L. Party: Renwick, Malcolm G. Party: Thompson, Amber Party: Longoria, Donavun L.Party: Renwick, Malcolm G.Party: Thompson, Amber |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement regarding severance and new filing fee; copies to Donavun Longoria and Amber Thompson Sent to: Renwick, Malcolm G. regarding severance and new filing fee; copies to Donavun Longoria and Amber Thompson |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Order Granting Motion to Sever for Parties: Longoria, Donavun L. for Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for Parties: Thompson, Amber Order Granting Motion to Sever Judge: : Haertling, Tiffany |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Judges' Docket Notes from Case File | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting (Judicial Officer: Haertling, Tiffany ) Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: : Haertling, Tiffany |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclsoure Party: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Request for Disclsoure |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure and Request for Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.