Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kelley, Mary K., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rachel Roland, against Kelley, John L., in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Order Transferring to the 367th Judicial District Court
Date: January 15, 2021Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: January 06, 2021Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to the 367th Judicial District Court | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Form VS 165 Mailed to Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Kelley, John L. Party: Roland, Rachel Party: Kelley, John L.Party: Roland, Rachel |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Johnson, James S. ) Agreed Final Decree of Divorce for Parties: Kelley, John L. for Parties: Kelley, Mary K. Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for BVS and/or SDU forms sent to Party: Roland, Rachel Party: Roland, Rachel |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit(s) Prove-Up Testimony of Mary K. Kelley Prove-Up Testimony of Mary K. Kelley |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service or Citation Party: Kelley, John L. Party: Kelley, John L. |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.