Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Lyndon, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Powell, Monica Angelique, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 367th Judicial District Court with Barnes, Margaret E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarnes, Margaret E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCustody Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House367th Judicial District Court |
Counter Petition/Claim
Date: January 04, 2021Request for BVS and/or SDU forms sent to
Date: January 21, 2021Original Petition/Application
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion of Coparenting Class Regarding: Powell, Monica Angelique of Coparenting Class |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Party: Powell, Monica Angelique Party: Powell, Monica Angelique |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for BVS and/or SDU forms sent to Party: Schraeder, Darren Louis Party: Schraeder, Darren Louis |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter (8:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) 1/5-Set by Judge Barnes 1/5-Set by Judge Barnes |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders (Judicial Officer: Barnes, Margaret E. ) | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Barnes, Margaret E.) 12/17-Set by LBrown (ProSe); states that Other side agrees to setting. 12/17-Set by LBrown (ProSe); states that Other side agrees to setting. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counter Petition/Claim Filed by: Powell, Monica Angelique Filed by: Powell, Monica Angelique |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Filed by: Powell, Monica Angelique Filed by: Powell, Monica Angelique |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition/Application in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship Filing Party: Brown, Lyndon in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.