Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Panther Creek Transportation, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Calley D. Callahan, against Zurich American Insurance Company, Ohl Usa, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 462nd Judicial District Court with Breading, Lee Ann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBreading, Lee Ann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryDebt/Contract: Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House462nd Judicial District Court |
Request for Issuance of
Date: August 31, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: August 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Citation Party: OHL USA, Inc. - Citation |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Affidavit of Service - Zurich American Insurance Company Party: Zurich American Insurance Company Affidavit of Service - Zurich American Insurance Company |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Affidavit of Service - Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Party: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Affidavit of Service - Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Affidavit of Service - Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company Party: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company Affidavit of Service - Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citations Made by: Panther Creek Transportation, Inc. Citations |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation eserved in envelope #45851292 OHL USA, Inc. Served 09/01/2020 1:17 PM Returned 09/03/2020 8:55 AM Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. Served 09/01/2020 Returned 09/02/2020 Zurich American Insurance Company Served 09/01/2020 Returned 09/02/2020 Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company Served 09/01/2020 Returned 09/02/2020 eserved in envelope #45851292 |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.