Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney, represented by Kyle C. Steele, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts County Court At Law #2 - BF with Ramirez, Robert C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamirez, Robert C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi - Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court At Law #2 - BF |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: August 03, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: District Attorney (JN) Party: Knotts, Dadreanna Lashay Party: State of Texas Party: Steele, Kyle C. Party: District Attorney (JN)Party: Knotts, Dadreanna LashayParty: State of TexasParty: Steele, Kyle C. |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Billing Statement with Bill of Costs sent to Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Due Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Ramirez, Robert C. ) Agreed Judgment for Parties: Knotts, Dadreanna Lashay for Parties: State of Texas for Parties: Steele, Kyle C - Atty Agreed Judgment Judge: : Ramirez, Robert C. |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bond Forfeiture (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Robert C.) 05/19/2021 Reset by Court to 06/30/2021 06/30/2021 Reset by Court to 07/28/2021
Judge: Ramirez, Robert C. |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Citattion Party: Steele, Kyle C - Atty Citattion |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation by First Class Mail Knotts, Dadreanna Lashay Served 08/31/2020 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Sent to DA via interoffice Steele, Kyle C - Atty Served 09/25/2020 Returned 09/29/2020 Sent to DA via interoffice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.