Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Assessed Costs filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle, Fadeyi, Olusoji Morohunfoluwa, in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 442nd Judicial District Court with Haertling, Tiffany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaertling, Tiffany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryAg - Support |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House442nd Judicial District Court |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to:
Date: July 21, 2022Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case)
Date: July 19, 2022Answer(s) and/or Response(s)
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | File sent to Records Management (storage) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Attorney General of Texas (Child Support) Party: Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle Party: Edwards, Conswella L. Party: Attorney General of Texas (Child Support)Party: Bo, Yoly Jeanne MurielleParty: Edwards, Conswella L. |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Judge, Not Required ) Notice of Nonsuit for Parties: Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle for Parties: Fadeyi, Olusoji Morohunfoluwa for Parties: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Notice of Nonsuit |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned Yoly Jeanne Murielle Bo Party: Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle Yoly Jeanne Murielle Bo |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Env #63675442 Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle Returned Unserved 05/12/2022 Returned 05/12/2022 Env #63675442 |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Env #63675442 Requested By Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Bo, Yoly Jeanne Murielle Returned Unserved 05/12/2022 Anticipated Method Personal Returned 05/12/2022 Env #63675442 |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance of Citation Made by: Office Of The Attorney General, Child Support Division Citation |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer(s) and/or Response(s) Response to Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship Party: Fadeyi, Olusoji Morohunfoluwa Response to Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent Child Relationship |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Issuance returned Yoly Bo Yoly Bo |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Olusoji Fadeyi Olusoji Fadeyi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.