Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
James H. Pearson filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Denton County, TX, . Denton County, TX Superior Courts 431st Judicial District Court with Bailey, Jonathan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBailey, Jonathan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2014 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDenton County, TX |
|
Filing Court House431st Judicial District Court |
Original Answer
Date: June 13, 2014Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing)
Date: May 09, 2014Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Date: April 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: Kennard, Karla Party: Pearson, James H. Party: Pfister, John J., Jr. Party: Kennard, KarlaParty: Pearson, James H.Party: Pfister, John J., Jr. |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (closes entire case) (Judicial Officer: Bailey, Jonathan ) Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution for Parties: Kennard, Karla for Parties: Pfister Borserine & Associates, P.L.L.C. for Parties: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Judge: : Bailey, Jonathan |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Courts Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bailey, Jonathan) LE: 6/13/14 LE: 6/13/14 Judge: Bailey, Jonathan |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Kennard, Karla Mailed to: Kennard, Karla |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Pfister, John J., Jr. Mailed to: Pfister, John J., Jr. |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Jury/Jury Dismissal Setting Mailed to: Pearson, James H. Mailed to: Pearson, James H. |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Et. Seq. Party: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Et. Seq. |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment/Appealable order sent to: Party: First National Bank Southwest Party: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Party: First National Bank SouthwestParty: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Final Order/Judgment/Decree (partial case closing) (Judicial Officer: Judge, Not Required ) Partial Notice of Nonsuit for Parties: First National Bank Southwest for Parties: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Partial Notice of Nonsuit Judge: : Judge, Not Required |
|
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from: John Pfister, Jr. Party: Pfister, John J., Jr. John Pfister, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.