We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Jerome Rudolph Foitek , Et Al Vs. Brinker International, Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago

Foitek , Jerome Rudolph, Foitek , Mary, filed a(n) Property case represented by Sunosky, James T., against Brinker International, Inc., Emerson Commercial Management Us, Llc, Sweetwater Investment Group, Llc, represented by Bolduc, Joshua R, Kim, Eugene Y, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.

Case Details for Foitek , Jerome Rudolph v. Brinker International, Inc. , et al.

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

April 28, 2022

Category

Property

Last Refreshed

October 11, 2023

Filing Location

Dallas County, TX

Filing Court House

193rd District Court

Parties for Foitek , Jerome Rudolph v. Brinker International, Inc. , et al.

Plaintiffs

Foitek , Jerome Rudolph

Foitek , Mary

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Sunosky, James T.

Defendants

Brinker International, Inc.

Emerson Commercial Management Us, Llc

Sweetwater Investment Group, Llc

Attorneys for Defendants

Bolduc, Joshua R

Kim, Eugene Y

Case Documents for Foitek , Jerome Rudolph v. Brinker International, Inc. , et al.

ISSUE CITATION

Date: October 12, 2022

ISSUE CITATION

Date: October 27, 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE

Date: September 08, 2022

Case Events for Foitek , Jerome Rudolph v. Brinker International, Inc. , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event 193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore
Jury Trial - Civil
Docket Event 193rd Notice of Dismissal Settlement
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Docket Event SETTLEMENT LETTER
RULE 11
SETTLEMENT
Docket Event INACTIVATE CASE (OCA)
Docket Event DEFENDANT TRAD & NO EVID MSJ
MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
TRAD & NO EVID
Docket Event CRESCENT MEDICAL CENTER
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Docket Event PROPOSED ORDER (DF) TRAD & NO EVID MSJ
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Docket Event ENNIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-BILLING
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Docket Event ENNIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Docket Event OFFICER'S CERT-C.O.R. CITY OF ENNIS
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
C.O.R. CITY OF ENNIS
See all events