Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gossip Boutique Spa, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Garza, Fernando R, Faubus, Caroline A, Buzbee, Anthony G, Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia, Durrett, J Brantley, Iii, (total of 5) See All against Ray, Jocelyn C, First Fleet Corporation, Ray, Dexter, Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc., represented by Davis, Jeffrey Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2018 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion - New Trial
Date: June 03, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NEW TRIAL Motion - New Trial ZOOM CT. SET BY TRULA 713-735-4141 |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: INTERVENOR MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Proposed Order for New Trial |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE ADDRESSED TO M FERNANDEZ FROM ATTORNEY PHIL MORGAN |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Special Setting (TRIAL) NEW 99 X MATHERSON & DEXTER RAY |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL ORDER TO SEVER - J BRANTLEY DURRETT, III |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TAM LUU |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - JUDGMENT MODIFIED FINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.