Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Spi-Sol, Llc, Series Yyy, filed a(n) Property case represented by Harter, Kenneth Stuart, against Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Heirs Of Mark D. Meadows, Wells Fargo Bank, N. A., represented by Harter, Kenneth Stuart, Ocker, Dorotha M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 11, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEES NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM FEES MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES UNOPPOSED |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.