Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Yee, Wai Lee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shamoun, C Gregory, against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A, represented by Martinelli, Brent, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2021 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 18, 2021APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 11, 2021ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION AGREED JUDGMENT FILED |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED JUDMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT - MAI CALDWELL RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF COSTS |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - EXECUTED GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - WELLS FARGO BANK NA RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE MAI CALDWELL |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.