Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Springfield, Glen, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Criss, David, against Dynamic Roofing General Contractor, Llc, represented by Dertinger, Justin J, Stark, Katherine Howard, Wilson, Brandon C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
PLAINTIFF’S ORIGINAL PETITION
COMES NOW, Plaintiff, GLEN SPRINGFIELD, and files this his Original Petition against Defendant, DYNAMIC ROOFING GENERAL CONTRACTOR, LLC, and for cause of action would respectfully show the Court and Jury as follows:
1....
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 24, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 09, 2022COUNTER CLAIM
Date: May 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION GLEN SPRINGFIELD |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONSIDER ON SUBMISSION MOTION WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO WITHDRAW NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY WILLIAM E. REID'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY WILLIAM E. REID MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UPDATE OF FIRM ADDRESS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.