Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mcguire, Kevin Thomas, Sexton, Mark, against Real Time Transportation Corp, represented by Koss, Gregory L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC against Real Time Transportation Corporation in the 101st Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiff is seeking monetary relief of $250,000 or less, excluding interest, dama...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 16, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES AND LIST OF EXHIBITS MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTON FOR COURT ORDERED MEDIATION MOTION - MEDIATION |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment 8VIA ZOOM * SHANNON TABRON - 866-530-7442 EXT 411 |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.