Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tbk Bank, Ssb, Tsk Bank, Ssb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Neerman, Jonathan D, against Im Services Group, Llc, K4 Services Llc, Mclarty, Henry Alec, represented by Estes, David H, Thomas, Drew Martin, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 12, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 20, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 20, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2021WAIVER
Date: October 07, 2021Motion - Default Judgment
Date: November 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2021MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE SENT VIA EMAIL/FAX
Date: December 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: December 10, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 25, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT
Date: November 17, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: December 09, 2022RESPONSE
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: November 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: December 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 06, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 07, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 23, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 01, 2023Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: January 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 02, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 01, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: December 20, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2023MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2023OBJECTION
Date: April 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER DENYING TBK BANK, SSB'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
OPPOSITION TO ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT OBJECTION DEFENDANT HENRY ALEC MCLARTY'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING BY SUBMISSION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT BY SUBMISSION |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
TBK'S MOTION TO JUDGMENT MOTION - JUDGMENT |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST HENRY ALEC MCLARTY |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER BRIEF TO JUDGE WILLIAMS CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE ORDER - MISC. GRANTING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.