Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dewasme, Steve, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Guerrero, Rogelio, Scheumack, Griffin, against Garland Independent School District, represented by Brandt, Christopher, Little, Rocky, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 02, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION-STEVE DEWASME CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION STEVE DEWASME |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOT CHANGE OF ADDRESS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER-DESIGNATION CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE DESIGNATION |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COUNTER AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT DEFENDANT GARLAND ISD'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COUNTER-AFFIDAVITS |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF-CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT MISCELLANOUS EVENT CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER-CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.