Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sieger, Patty, Sieger, Raymond, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clay, Brennan, Greco, Shelly, against Cox, Kendra, Cox, Kimberly, New Vision Transport, Inc, Spain, Rickey, represented by Ewing, Jerry L, Gwinn, Stephen W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 06, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOH RE: MINOR PROVEUP - 5/03/2023 - 9:30AM ***ZOOM HEARING*** Minor Prove Up SET WITH SANDI WILLIAMS VIA EMAIL. TO BE HEARD VIA ZOOM WITH LIVESTREAM IN THE COURTROOM |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil SETTLED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM REQUIRED |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOH RE: MINOR PROVEUP - 5/03/2023 - 9:30AM ***ZOOM HEARING*** NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: MINOR PROVEUP - 5/03/2023 - 9:30AM ***ZOOM HEARING*** |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM AGREED - APPOINTING |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AGREED - GAL: IGNACIA BARBERO |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM AGREED |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO APPOINT GAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.