Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Grant, Margaret, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greco, Shelly, Jobin, Lauren V, Miers, Mitchell, Rodriguez, Victor R, against Ordaz, Alexander, Shearer Supply, Inc., represented by Balido, Carlos A, Martin, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) LEVEL 3 MV CASE |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
ABEL RODRIGUEZ CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF MARGARET GRANT CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF MARGARET GRANT |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S 5TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SERVICE & FILING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT - 5TH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF SERVICE & FILING RECORD AFFIDAVIT |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL 1ST |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.