Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hester, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Said, Rabia, against Banks, Andrae Jorod, Banks, Andre Jorod, Dart Transit Company, represented by Funderburg, Ryan T., Scudder, Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 23, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil InitialTrial Setting (Level 3) |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO ALL PARTIES |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
116 DISPO Final Disposition Hearing |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
116 DISPO Final Disposition Hearing |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR DISMISSAL HEARING CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REQUEST EXTEND TIME FOR DISMISSAL HEARING |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING DEF(S) ANDRAE A/K/A ANDRE JOROD BANKS AND DART TRANSIT CO MOTION TO QUASH Motion - Quash DEFTS-30M-FILED-04/26/2022--SET BY-MARTHA PUEBLA-469-766-1418 **CC REQUESTED** **IN-PERSON HEARING** |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.